Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Colleen M Colton, against Melissa A Wise, Unknown Parties In Possession #1 As To Unit #1, Unknown Parties In Possession #2 As To Unit #1, represented by Mimi K Mcandrews, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts Circuit with Division AW presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT
Date: March 03, 2008SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: February 14, 2008NOTICE OF CANCELLATION
Date: August 11, 2008SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: February 14, 2008NOTICE
Date: November 07, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 25, 2008NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: July 17, 2008MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: March 03, 2008NOTICE OF FILING
Date: February 15, 2008ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED OUT
Date: August 05, 2010AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 17, 2008SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED)
Date: February 14, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 25, 2008LIS PENDENS BOOK 022409 PAGE 00652
Date: January 25, 2008NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY
Date: March 03, 2008SUMMONS ISSUED
Date: January 25, 2008AFFIDAVIT
Date: July 17, 2008CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: January 25, 2008ANSWER
Date: February 26, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2008DEFAULT
Date: March 25, 2008AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 03, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
ADMINISTRATIVELY CLOSED OUT DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING DTD AUGUST 2, 2010 JUDGE SASSER |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER | |
November 07, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DISMISSAL AND DISCHARGE |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING ON 8/12/08 @ 3:00 PM / RE: MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT |
|
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT AND REQUEST FOR ATTORNEY'S FEES---AUGUST 12, 2008 AT 3:00 P.M. |
|
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS. Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
|
July 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF PLAINTIFF'S COUNSEL. Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
|
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT NKA ANASTASIA ALVAREGA Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION #1 AS TO UNIT #1 |
|
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
|
March 03, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF WELLS FARGO BANK NA |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.