Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Peter Degregory, filed a(n) General Negligence - Torts case against Discovery Property Casualty Insurance Company, Fabiola Espinosa, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, represented by John A Howard, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 25, 2008 |
CategoryOther Negligence |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Negligence |
This complaint is filed by the plaintiff, Peter DeGregory III, against the defendants Discover Property & Casualty Insurance Company, State Farm Mutual Automobile Insurance Company, and Fabiola Espinosa. The complaint alleges that on or about June 15...
COMPLAINT
Date: January 25, 2008REQUEST
Date: February 25, 2008REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: January 25, 2008REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: May 07, 2008ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: February 25, 2008AGREED ORDER
Date: May 12, 2008REQUEST
Date: February 25, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: February 25, 2008DISCLOSURE
Date: July 10, 2008AGREED ORDER
Date: July 17, 2008OBJECTION
Date: July 25, 2008REQUEST
Date: July 25, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: June 25, 2008AGREED ORDER
Date: September 25, 2008NOTICE
Date: August 04, 2008STIPULATION AND ORDER
Date: November 17, 2008MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: September 02, 2008REQUEST
Date: February 25, 2008RESPONSE TO REQ TO PRODUCE
Date: April 07, 2008NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: July 28, 2008NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON PARTY
Date: April 30, 2008OBJECTION
Date: July 25, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 04, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 04, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: January 25, 2008MEDIATION REPORT
Date: October 10, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET Filed by ATTORNEY JOHN A HOWARD |
|
November 24, 2008 | Docket Event | NOTICE | |
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION AND ORDER FINAL ORDER OF DISMISSAL D LEWIS RECORDED BK 27291 PG 942 |
|
November 17, 2008 | Docket Event | DISPOSED BY JUDGE | |
October 10, 2008 | Docket Event | MEDIATION REPORT | |
September 30, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / SERVED TAKESHI JONES |
|
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER MOTION TO BE EXCUSED GRANTED SEE ORDER DLEWIS |
|
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE Filed by DEFENDANT DISCOVERY PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 25, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION BE EXCUSED FROM PORTION TRIAL DOCKET Filed by DEFENDANT DISCOVERY PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
|
September 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING SUP IME REPORT Filed by DEFENDANT DISCOVERY PROPERTY CASUALTY INSURANCE COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.