Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Porsche Financial Services, filed a(n) Other Circuit case represented by Ryan K Williams, against Arnauld Sylvain, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 24, 2008 |
CategoryOther Circuit |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL W/OUT PREJUDICE Filed by PLAINTIFF PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES |
|
February 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING Associated to docket NOVD filed on 2008-02-26 |
|
February 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT GISSEN & ZAWYER PROCESS SERVICE INC, OF LOST ORIG SUMMONS TO ARNAULD SYLVAIN, W/ATTCHD SERVICE RETURN, SERVED 1/26/08 |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF PORSCHE LEASING LTD, OF ATTCHD ORIG REPLEVIN BOND IN AMN'T OF $59,314.48 Filed by ATTORNEY RYAN K WILLIAMS |
|
February 01, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING OF PORSCH LEASING LTD, OF ATTCHD EXECUTED AFFI OF STEPHANIE DUBPOS Filed by ATTORNEY RYAN K WILLIAMS |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event | PENDING | |
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
SUMMONS ISSUED SM-08-015209 Filed by DEFENDANT ARNAULD SYLVAIN |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
FEE/WRIT ($85.00) Filed by PLAINTIFF PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
CIVIL COVER SHEET Filed by PLAINTIFF PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES |
|
January 24, 2008 | Docket Event |
COMPLAINT Filed by PLAINTIFF PORSCHE FINANCIAL SERVICES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.