Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Hsbc Bank Usa Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Patrice A Tedescko, against Cheralyn Jantal Joseph, Palm Beach Plantation Homeowners Association Inc, Unknown Tenant No 1, Unknown Tenant No 2, represented by Keith F Backer, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Jeffrey J. Colbath presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
RESPONSE TO:
Date: August 27, 2008REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 27, 2008EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: January 05, 2009MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: July 31, 2008ANSWER
Date: February 04, 2008ANSWER
Date: February 27, 2008FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023246 PAGE 00700
Date: May 18, 2009MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: January 06, 2009ORDER
Date: January 05, 2009EMERGENCY MOTION
Date: December 23, 2008FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 022988 PAGE 00262
Date: December 03, 2008RESPONSE TO REQ FOR ADMISSION
Date: August 25, 2008MOTION TO WITHDRAW
Date: August 14, 2008ORDER
Date: August 14, 2008MOTION
Date: June 30, 2008REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: May 21, 2008REQUEST
Date: May 21, 2008MOTION
Date: May 08, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2008AFFIDAVIT OF INDEBTEDNESS
Date: March 24, 2008REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: March 14, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 23329 PAGE 0470 ISSUED TO HSBC BANK USA, N.A. |
|
July 10, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT OF POST-JUDGEMENT INTEREST AND ADVANCES Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NA |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLT FOR $100.00 Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NA |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NA |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB314705. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NA |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET BANNER AND LAPTOP RECEIPTS |
|
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB314707. Filed by PLAINTIFF HSBC BANK USA NA |
|
June 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Filed by DEFENDANT CHERALYN JANTAL JOSEPH |
|
May 18, 2009 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023246 PAGE 00700 $550,224.39 SALE DATE JUNE 18 09 DTD MAY 18 09 PHILLIPS $550,224.39 Jun 18 2009 12:00AM May 18 2009 12:00AM $550,224.39 SALE DATE JUNE 18 09 DTD MAY 18 09 PHILLIPS |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.