Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wells Fargo Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Ali J Gilson, Brandon Loshak, Mark N O'Grady, Owei Z Belleh, against Jane Doe, John Doe, Monica D Adli, Palmetto Pine Homeowners Association Inc, Yaser Adli, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
MOTION
Date: February 06, 2013FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 25960 PAGE 488
Date: April 18, 2013MEDIATION REPORT
Date: July 12, 2010MOTION
Date: December 12, 2013MEDIATION REPORT
Date: July 13, 2010NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 15, 2013ORDER
Date: June 28, 2011ORDER
Date: December 18, 2013MOTION
Date: November 15, 2013FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 023822 PAGE 01369
Date: April 01, 2010MOTION
Date: May 11, 2010NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: December 13, 2010NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: June 07, 2010NOTICE OF MEDIATION
Date: May 26, 2010ORDER BOOK 023778 PAGE 01929
Date: April 01, 2010COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2015 | Docket Event |
SERVICE RETURNED (NUMBERED) SERVED MONICA D ADLI 5/15/15 WRIT EXECUTED ON 6/8/15 |
|
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
May 19, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER DENYING ON DEFENDANT'S EMERGENCY MOTION TO STOP WRIT OF POSSESSION: DENIED: E BREGER DTD 5/18/15 |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
CAFF/REOPEN ($50.00) Filed by DEFENDANT MONICA D ADLI |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of -$50.00 was made on receipt CAMB997134. Filed by DEFENDANT MONICA D ADLI |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
EMERGENCY MOTION FOR STOP WRIT OF POSSESSION F/B DFT MONICA ADLI UP 05/18/15 Filed by DEFENDANT MONICA D ADLI |
|
May 18, 2015 | Docket Event |
REOPEN Filed by DEFENDANT MONICA D ADLI |
|
May 14, 2015 | Docket Event |
WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO 4871 ALFRESCO ST BOCA RATON FL 33428 TO WELLS FARGO BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION TRUSTEE PBSO-EDW WPO-15-002657 Filed by DEFENDANT MONICA D ADLI |
|
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event | REDISPOSED | |
March 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION. GRANTED. THE WRIT OF POSSESSION SHALL NOT ISSUE BEFORE 5/8/2015. J.KEYSER DTD 3/9/2015 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.