Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association, Us Bank National Association As Trustee For Wachovia, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Steven B Greenfield, against Jane Doe, John Doe, Kanitta Krachachang, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Inc, Unknown Spouse Of Kanitta Krachachang, (total of 7) See All represented by Rebecca Radosevich, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE
Date: March 14, 2013MOTION TO STRIKE
Date: April 29, 2013STATEMENT
Date: November 30, 2012ORDER
Date: May 08, 2013MOTION TO COMPEL
Date: July 13, 2010MOTION
Date: March 29, 2010STIPULATION
Date: May 15, 2013FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 26029 PAGE 873
Date: May 15, 2013NOTICE
Date: December 07, 2009ORDER GRANTING
Date: January 10, 2013ORDER
Date: May 18, 2009ORDER
Date: December 12, 2012MOTION
Date: November 26, 2012MOTION
Date: May 21, 2008MOTION/NOTICE JUDG DISMISSAL
Date: October 10, 2012NOTICE
Date: October 11, 2011ORDER
Date: June 27, 2011ORDER
Date: April 08, 2010ORDER
Date: April 14, 2010REQUEST
Date: January 21, 2010REPLY/RESPONSE
Date: December 07, 2009RESPONSE TO:
Date: September 21, 2009MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER
Date: September 21, 2009MOTION
Date: December 31, 2008MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: June 26, 2009REQUEST
Date: December 15, 2008ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: December 15, 2008REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: December 15, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2008RESPONSE TO:
Date: January 28, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2016 | Docket Event |
CHECK PRINTED A Disbursment of $100.00 on Check Number 4604 to SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER |
|
November 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
COPY DISB REQUEST FOR SHARON R BOCK CLERK & COMPTROLLER, UNCLAIMED FUNDS F.S. 116.21 |
|
October 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISBURSEMENTS |
|
October 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
CHECK PRINTED A Disbursment of $114,900.00 on Check Number 50370 to DISB US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
September 17, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE BOOK 26311 PAGE 0081 ISSUED TO 2 PROP LLC |
|
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO 2 PROP LLC FOR $114,900 |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $2,595.30 was made on receipt CAMB813938. Filed By |
|
August 16, 2013 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $5,745.00 was made on receipt CAMB813937. Filed By |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET INFORMATION SHEET ATTACHED (NO PPUB; NO COFS ISSUED) |
|
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $111,750.30 was made on receipt CAMB812908. Filed By |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.