Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association As Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Marc Brown, against Auto Owners Insurance Company, Courtney Yorker, Jane Doe, Jeff Matzelle, John Doe, (total of 12) See All in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 24, 2013 | Docket Event | EXHIBIT "A" ORIGINAL NOTE ORIGINAL MORTGAGE DEMAND LETTER PAYMENT HISTORY | |
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED AFTER OTHER Associated to docket ODIS filed on 2011-01-31 |
|
January 31, 2011 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 024343 PAGE 01951 ON STATUS CONFERENCE THAT SAID CASE BE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE JUDGE COLTON 1/31/11 |
|
November 23, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE ON 1/31/11 @ 1:30 11/23/10 |
|
December 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
DEFAULT AND LARONICA YORKER, COURTNEY YORKER JR, LARRY YORKER JR, JEFF MATZELLE, AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY, STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE Filed by DEFENDANT LARRY YORKER |
|
December 15, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DEFAULT NOT ENTERED AS TO UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LARRY YORKER AND UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF COURTNEY YORKER JR. - OTHER: MOTION THE COURT |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR DEFAULT Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LARONCIA YORKER; UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF LARRY YORKER, JR; JOHN DOE; JANE DOE Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
MOTION FOR SUMMARY FINAL JUDGMENT OF FORECLOSURE AND TAXATION OF ATTY'S FEES AND COSTS Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.