Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Us Bank National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Colleen M Colton, against Caroline G Brayman, Richard S Brayman, Unknown Parties In Possession #1, Unknown Parties In Possession #2, Washington Mutual Bank, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2008 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 022839 PAGE 00222
Date: August 26, 2008EXHIBIT
Date: August 26, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: January 11, 2008MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 23, 2008Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF TITLE ISSUED TO US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
October 20, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF DISB |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
BID SHEET BANNER & BID LAPTOP RECEIPT ATT |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
CERTIFICATE OF SALE SOLD TO PLAINTIFF FOR $100.00 |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
AFFIDAVIT AS TO ADDITIONAL ADVANCES Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
RECEIPT FOR PAYMENT A Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB246296. Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
September 29, 2008 | Docket Event |
FORECLOSURE FEES ADDED A Foreclosure Fees Payment of $70.70 was made on receipt CAMB246297. Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
FINAL JUDGMENT FORECLOSURE BOOK 022839 PAGE 00222 $150 791.33 SALE DATE SEPT 29 2008 DTD 8/26/08 COLBATH $791.33 Sep 29 2008 12:00AM Aug 26 2008 12:00AM $150 791.33 SALE DATE SEPT 29 2008 DTD 8/26/08 COLBATH |
|
August 26, 2008 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BY JUDGE Associated to docket FJFC filed on 2008-08-26 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.