Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Us Bank National Association As Trustee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Nikolay Sergeev Kolev, against Brookfield Homeowners Association Inc, Mortgage Electronic Registration Systems Incorporated, Tenant # 1, Tenant #2, Tenant # 3, (total of 8) See All represented by Anastasios Tom Spyredes, Kevin L Hagen, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2007 |
CategoryReal Property/Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedSeptember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
This complaint is a foreclosure action filed by U.S. Bank National Association as Trustee against Ulisses Ribero Dos Santos and other unknown parties. The plaintiff alleges that they are the holder of the mortgage note and mortgage on a property loca...
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023645 PAGE 00412
Date: January 08, 2010MOTION
Date: January 07, 2010ANSWER & AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: January 12, 2009MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: April 29, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: April 29, 2008MOTION TO DISMISS
Date: January 22, 2008NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL
Date: April 29, 2008COMPLAINT
Date: December 31, 2007Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Filed by DEFENDANT ULISSES RIBERO DOS SANTOS |
|
January 20, 2010 | Docket Event |
RETURNED MAIL Filed by DEFENDANT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ULISSES RIBERO DOS SANTOS |
|
January 19, 2010 | Docket Event | RETURNED MAIL | |
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023645 PAGE 00412 DISMISSING CASE AND CANCELING NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS- DTD JANUARY 7, 2010 JUDGE GARRISON |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
DISPOSED BEFORE OTHER Associated to docket ODIS filed on 2010-01-08 |
|
January 08, 2010 | Docket Event |
ADDITIONAL COMMENTS ***ORIG NOTE RTND 7/21/10***NAZ Associated to docket ODIS filed on 2010-01-08 |
|
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO VOLUNTARILY DISMISS CASE AND CANCEL NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
January 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
FINAL DISPOSITION SHEET DISMISSED BEFORE HEARING |
|
June 24, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF REASONABLE ATTORNEY FEES Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
|
June 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF FILING AFFIDAVIT OF AMOUNTS DUE AND OWING Filed by PLAINTIFF US BANK NATIONAL ASSOCIATION AS TRUSTEE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.