Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) Parking Citation case against Hanna Simchi, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2005 |
CategoryParking Citation |
Last RefreshedSeptember 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
CALENDAR HISTORY 03/01/06 1100 CLDR= C DIV= N PRETRIAL HEARING DELETED- ON 031306 RESET TO 0000 DIV: REMARKS: GREY--DEFT N/PRES. STOP ON TAG |
|
October 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
TRAFFIC BASIC INFORMATION JITB JUDICIAL INFORMATION TRAFFIC BASIC RECORD ENTERED BY: U383 COURT Date: 01/30/06 COURT: SCHEDULE: N COURT Time: 0900 PARKING TICKET: 317250 FINE: $252.00 COMMENTS: CEF 020306, CEF AND LABELS ORDERED, CEF |
|
October 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT HISTORY X/JITA JUDICIAL INFORMATION TRAFFIC ARRAIGNMENT DEF IS SIMCHI HANNA 6387744 LEGACY CASE NUMBER: 63877447132764 ARRAIGNMENT WAIVED: NOLLE PROS: D6 DATE: DATE: 013006 JUDGE: COURT: ATTORNEY: PD APPT: VIOLATION BUREAU: DEFENDANT PRES: ADVISED OF RIGHTS: WRITTEN PLEA: NG PLEA: ADJUDICATION: CASE DISMISSED: PROOF LIC/INSP: ORDER PROBABLE CAUSE PTI DATE: BOOK: PAGE: AFFIDAVIT: PSI Date: COMMENTS: None |
|
February 07, 2006 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 30, 2006 | Docket Event |
DOCKET HISTORY WRITTEN NOT GUILTY PLEA FILED ON 013006 |
|
December 31, 2005 | Docket Event | CITATION/CASE CREATED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.