Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Attorney State filed a(n) Municipal Ordinance case against Pedro M Vargas, represented by Jan Peter Weiss, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts with Paul A. Damico presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2024 |
CategoryMunicipal Ordinance |
Last RefreshedOctober 06, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
|
08/21/2013
Date: January 15, 202409/16/2013
Date: January 28, 202408/28/2013
Date: January 22, 202408/22/2013
Date: January 17, 202409/20/2013
Date: January 30, 202408/29/2013
Date: January 23, 202408/23/2013
Date: January 19, 202409/16/2013
Date: January 27, 202408/26/2013
Date: January 21, 202408/19/2013
Date: January 11, 202408/19/2013
Date: January 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 28, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 27, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 23, 2024 | Docket Event | SERVICE RETURN (ATTACHED) | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | COURT EVENT FORM | |
January 21, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION | |
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | RECALLED | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
January 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.