Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Brandon Jones, filed a(n) case represented by Joseph Cichowski, against Andre Malivert, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateApril 21, 2015 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL BOOK 28408 PAGE 322-322 WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLT |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
PAID $10.60 ON RECEIPT 1731289 $10.60 1731289 Fully Paid |
|
June 30, 2016 | Docket Event | DISPOSED AFTER OTHER | |
June 03, 2016 | Docket Event |
ORDER EX PARTE ON DFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY: BRANDON JONES SHALL RESPOND TO DFT'S ANDRE MALIVERT, SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION IN 10 DAYS. DTD 6-3-16 C CARACUZZO EX PARTE ON DFTS' MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY: BRANDON JONES SHALL RESPOND TO DFT'S ANDRE MALIVERT, SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION IN 10 DAYS. DTD 6-3-16 C CARACUZZO |
|
May 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH REGARD TO DEFENDANT'S RULE 1.360 EXAMINATION OF PLAINTIFF F\B PLT, BRANDON JONES |
|
May 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
WITNESS LIST , EXPERT AND EXHIBIT LIST F/B DFT MALIVERT |
|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
OBJECTION AND MOTION FOR PROTECTIVE ORDER WITH REGARD TO DFTS RULE 1.360 EXAMINATION OF PLT FILED BY PLT |
|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST TO PRODUCE EXPERT RESPONSE FOR PRODUCTION TO PLT (F/B DFT) |
|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST SECOND SUPPLEMENTAL REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLT (F/B DFT) |
|
May 20, 2016 | Docket Event |
REQUEST FOR PHYSICAL EXAMINATION UNDER FLA CIV P 1.360 AND DISCLOSURE OF EXPERT WITNESS F/B DFT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.