Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Century Surety Company, filed a(n) case represented by Michael B Buckley, against Amanda Renata De Moraes, Donel Enterprises Inc Dba Miracle Car Wash, Steven A Belson, represented by Darryl Brent Kogan, Eric H Luckman, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateJanuary 11, 2008 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
STIPULATION FOR DISMISSAL |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 023534 PAGE 01375 E FINE |
|
November 03, 2009 | Docket Event | DISMISSED AFTER HEARING | |
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
SUBPOENA RETURNED / NOT SERVED MICHAEL PUDER |
|
September 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT Filed by PLAINTIFF CENTURY SURETY COMPANY |
|
September 03, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
ORDER GRANTING EXPARTE ORDER GRANTING DFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL CENTURY'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES |
|
September 01, 2009 | Docket Event | LETTER | |
August 28, 2009 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL EXPARTE, DISCOVERY Filed by DEFENDANT DONEL ENTERPRISES INC DBA MIRACLE CAR WASH |
|
August 14, 2009 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES Filed by PLAINTIFF CENTURY SURETY COMPANY |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.