Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Lloyd Ohara, filed a(n) case represented by Clifton C Curry, against Orius Telecom Productions Inc, Orius Telecom Services Inc, represented by Janel D Ortengren, Marc J Gottlieb, in the jurisdiction of Palm Beach County, FL, . Palm Beach County, FL Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateDecember 30, 2003 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 20, 2021 |
Filing LocationPalm Beach County, FL |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
ORDER OF DISMISSAL BOOK 21791 PAGE 0838 OF ACTION |
|
May 25, 2007 | Docket Event |
DISMISSED AFTER HEARING Associated to docket ODIS filed on 2007-05-25 |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF TELEPHONIC APPEARANCE. Filed by PLAINTIFF LLOYD OHARA |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO WITHDRAW AS COUNSEL. Filed by ATTORNEY CLIFTON C CURRY |
|
May 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
NOTICE OF HEARING ON 5/24/07. Filed by ATTORNEY CLIFTON C CURRY |
|
March 06, 2007 | Docket Event |
MOTION/NOTICE JUDG DISMISSAL HELD ON MAY 25 2007 @10:00 |
|
February 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY CHAPTER 11 - -5 63886 FILED BY MARC J GOTTLIEB ESQ Filed by DEFENDANT ORIUS TELECOM PRODUCTIONS INC |
|
September 14, 2005 | Docket Event |
AGREED ORDER ON DFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL-LTR DTD 9/09/05, PLTF PRODUCED ADDT'L DOCUMENTS AND MADE CERTIAN REPRESENTATIONS REGARDING THE LACK OF ADDITIONAL DOCUMENTS WHICH PARTIALLY RESOLVED THE ISSUES RAISED BY DFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL. **SEE ORDER** |
|
July 27, 2005 | Docket Event |
RE-NOTICE OF HEARING 9/14/05 @ 8:45 AM ON DFT'S MOTION TO COMPEL |
|
July 25, 2005 | Docket Event |
MOTION TO COMPEL W/ATTACHMENTS Filed by DEFENDANT ORIUS TELECOM PRODUCTIONS INC |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.