Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
American Express National Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Goldyn Ceo Llc, Henley, Crystal, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with PULAYYA, JUNA M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: March 05, 2024PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2024023937
Date: March 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $320.00 RECEIPT #2024023937 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 04/04/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN 3D BEFORE JUDGE: PULAYYA, JUNA M | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (STREAMLINED TRACK) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/04/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 SC 001206 SP | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | $ 7494.97 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.