Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Velocity Investments Llc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Rosario, Giovanni, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with PULAYYA, JUNA M presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
$ 3414.98 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: March 04, 2024STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)
Date: March 04, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: March 05, 2024SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: March 05, 2024PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2024023930
Date: March 06, 2024SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2024SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR 03/12/2024 GIOVANNI ROSARIO
Date: March 26, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, UNSERVED FOR 03/12/2024 GIOVANNI ROSARIO | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2024023930 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 04/04/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN 3D BEFORE JUDGE: PULAYYA, JUNA M | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | $ 3414.98 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/04/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 SC 001202 SP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.