Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Quezada, Pablo H, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with Sanders-Morency, Gabrielle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 04, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2024$ 3243.23 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: March 04, 2024SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: March 05, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: March 05, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 04, 2024PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2024023906
Date: March 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 3/30/2024 PARTY SERVED: PABLO H QUEZADA | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2024023906 | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 04/12/2024 AT 9:30 AM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | $ 3243.23 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/04/2024 CASE NUMBER 2024 SC 001191 SP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.