Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Bank Of America, N.A., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Matos, Sterling Alexander, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with Sanders-Morency, Gabrielle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 01, 2024 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: March 04, 2024$ 2873.73 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: March 01, 2024NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 01, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 01, 2024STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)
Date: March 01, 2024SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: March 01, 2024SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: March 04, 2024PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2024024151
Date: March 06, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 26, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 03/25/2024 PARTY SERVED: STERLING ALEXANDER MATOS | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2024024151 | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | SMALL CLAIMS PRE-TRIAL SET FOR 04/12/2024 AT 9:00 AM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | $ 2873.73 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | NON-MILITARY AFFIDAVIT | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK) | |
March 01, 2024 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.