Case Last Refreshed: 1 week ago
Jd Restoration Inc, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Citizens Property Insurance Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with Sanders-Morency, Gabrielle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2023 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedApril 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
AGREED ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT HEARING
Date: April 11, 2024JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT HEARING
Date: April 09, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: April 06, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: March 31, 2023ADDENDUM FOR SMALL CLAIMS OTHER FIRST PARTY INSURANCE BENEFITS
Date: March 31, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 31, 2023DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516
Date: February 15, 2024NOTICE OF APPEARANCE
Date: February 15, 2024NOTICE OF SHOWING GOOD CAUSE
Date: March 13, 2024NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (EMAILED TO ALL PARTIES)
Date: March 25, 2024DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF’S DISCOVERY
Date: March 22, 2024CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE
Date: February 06, 2024PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2023053299
Date: May 25, 2023GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: March 31, 2023$ 5298.81 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: March 31, 2023NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
Date: January 11, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 11, 2024 | Docket Event | AGREED ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT HEARING | |
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | JOINT MOTION TO APPEAR VIRTUALLY AT HEARING | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE (EMAILED TO ALL PARTIES) | |
March 25, 2024 | Docket Event | CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE SET FOR 04/22/2024 AT 9:45 AM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE | |
March 22, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFF’S DISCOVERY | |
March 13, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SHOWING GOOD CAUSE | |
February 26, 2024 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT’S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF’S COMPLAINT WITH PREJUDICEAND INCORPORATED MEMORANDUM OF LAW | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES PURSUANT TO RULE 2.516 | |
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.