Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Jamieson, Ian, Wills, Deidra, filed a(n) County Civil case against Osceola County Courthouse, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with Sanders-Morency, Gabrielle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 02, 2023 |
CategoryCounty Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: February 02, 2023NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
Date: January 12, 2024COPY OF NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AS DEFENDANT
Date: January 22, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | COPY OF NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE AS DEFENDANT | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | COUNTY CIVIL-LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 03/22/2024 AT 3:00 PM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $308.00 RECEIPT #2023011029 | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 02/02/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CC 000571 OT | |
February 02, 2023 | Docket Event | OSCEOLA COUNTY COURTHOUSE PLAINTIFFS NOTICE OF PETITION REQUEST FOR HEARING |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.