Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Us Bank Trust National Association, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Breckenridge Homeowners Association Inc, Decker, Samantha, Decker, Shawn R, Osceola County A Political Subdivision Of The State Florida, United Staes Of America On Behalf Of Secretary Of Housing And Urban Development, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeYOUNG, TOM Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 14, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 04, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
4/14/2023
Date: April 03, 20244/14/2023
Date: April 28, 20704/14/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/14/2023
Date: April 02, 20244/24/2023
Date: April 14, 20244/24/2023
Date: April 01, 20245/2/2023
Date: April 01, 20245/4/2023
Date: April 02, 20245/11/2023
Date: April 03, 20245/25/2023
Date: April 28, 20246/7/2023
Date: April 02, 20245/30/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/8/2023
Date: April 01, 20246/12/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/12/2023
Date: April 06, 20246/26/2023
Date: April 04, 20247/3/2023
Date: April 02, 20249/20/2023
Date: April 03, 20249/20/2023
Date: April 28, 20669/29/2023
Date: April 03, 202410/2/2023
Date: April 02, 202410/11/2023
Date: April 02, 202410/10/2023
Date: April 02, 202412/6/2023
Date: April 28, 205110/24/2023
Date: April 28, 202412/6/2023
Date: April 02, 202412/7/2023
Date: April 01, 202412/7/2023
Date: April 27, 202412/8/2023
Date: April 04, 20241/22/2024
Date: April 01, 20241/22/2024
Date: April 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2070 | Docket Event | ||
April 28, 2066 | Docket Event | ||
April 28, 2051 | Docket Event | ||
April 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 28, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 27, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.