Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Bridges, Deborah, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Carver, Jodie, Orlando Utilities Commission, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 13, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST FOR SIGNED CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER | |
June 08, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023057865 | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CHANGE OF HANDLING ATTORNEY AND AMENDED NOTICE OF DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT ORLANDO UTILITIES COMMISSION | |
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT ORLANDO UTILITIES COMMISSION | |
March 28, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $400.00 RECEIPT #2023030512 | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT | |
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 03/20/2023 CASE NUMBER 2023 CA 001191 AN |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.