Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Davila, Luis Antonio, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Home Depot Usa Inc, Jacques, Ralph, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeARENDAS, CHRISTINE E Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 26, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
PAYMENT $420.00 RECEIPT #2023030212
Date: March 27, 2023NOTICE OF FILING CONSENT TO JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: January 02, 2024DEFENDANT, HOME DEPOT USA INC'S MOTION TO COMPEL PLAINTIFF'S DISCOVERY RESPONSES
Date: January 26, 2024DEFENDANT, HOME DEPOT USA, INC.’S, FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 27, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING IN-PERSON DEPOSITION
Date: January 29, 2024REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 20, 2023DEFENDANT, HOME DEPOT USA, INC.’S, FIRST REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO PLAINTIFF
Date: June 27, 2023NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AS COUNSEL
Date: December 13, 2023SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: March 20, 2023COMPLAINT
Date: March 20, 2023NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 20, 2023REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT RALPH JACQUES
Date: March 20, 2023PLAINTIFF'S FIRST REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT, RALPH JACQUES
Date: March 20, 2023AMENDED COMPLAINT
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF TAKING CONTINUED VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION
Date: March 12, 2024JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: December 13, 2023DEFENDANT’S NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: June 27, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: August 04, 2023NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON-PARTY(AS TO LUIS ANTONIO DAVILA)
Date: January 24, 2024REQUEST FOR COPIES
Date: January 24, 2024DEFENDANT, HOME DEPOT USA, INC.'S, RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: July 17, 2023CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: March 20, 2023AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING IN-PERSON VIDEO DEPOSITION
Date: February 28, 2024PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 01, 2024PLAINTIFF'S NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: March 01, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: March 27, 2023AGREED ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION FOR SUBSTITUTION OF COUNSEL
Date: February 14, 2024NOTICE OF TAKING CONTINUED VIDEOTAPED DEPOSITION
Date: March 15, 2024ORDER OF INTENT TO DISMISS AS TO RALPH JAZQUES
Date: March 14, 2024PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS
Date: August 04, 2023NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: March 20, 2023AMENDED REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: June 06, 2023NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 18, 2024STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER
Date: March 20, 2023PLAINTIFF'S RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE
Date: March 01, 2024COVER LETTER RE: ORDER ON MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME
Date: March 13, 20247/17/2023
Date: April 05, 20247/17/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/6/2023
Date: April 27, 20596/27/2023
Date: April 19, 20248/4/2023
Date: April 02, 20247/17/2023
Date: April 04, 20247/5/2023
Date: April 08, 20246/6/2023
Date: April 06, 20246/27/2023
Date: April 03, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/27/2023
Date: April 02, 20246/6/2023
Date: April 21, 20243/27/2023
Date: April 01, 20244/9/2023
Date: April 03, 20243/27/2023
Date: April 08, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 06, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 04, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 09, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 08, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 01, 20243/20/2023
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2059 | Docket Event | ||
April 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.