Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Morales Gutierrez, Tibisay Elena, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Ree, Alice, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 20, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 17, 2023 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO EXTEND TIME PERIOD FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS | |
July 25, 2023 | Docket Event | LETTER TO JUDGE RE PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO EXTEND TIME PERIOD FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS WITH PROPOSED ORDER | |
July 20, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
July 19, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2023071417 | |
July 18, 2023 | Docket Event | MOTION TO EXTEND TIME PERIOD FOR SERVICE OF PROCESS ON DEFENDANT, ALICE REE | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF ELECTRONIC MAIL ADDRESSES | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES TO DEFENDANT | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | REQUEST TO PRODUCE TO DEFENDANT | |
July 17, 2023 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.