Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Hennenfent, Gregory C, Hennenfent, Mary, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Acme Barricades, Lc, Concepcion Rosa, Mariela C, The Lane Construction Corporation, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 03, 215 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 10, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
2/23/2024
Date: May 03, 202412/27/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/14/2023
Date: May 03, 202412/27/2023
Date: May 03, 20243/14/2023
Date: May 01, 20241/8/2024
Date: May 04, 20244/6/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/14/2023
Date: May 09, 20248/10/2023
Date: May 06, 202412/7/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/26/2024
Date: May 03, 202412/19/2023
Date: May 01, 20241/26/2024
Date: May 04, 20243/27/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/8/2023
Date: May 02, 20248/10/2023
Date: May 02, 202412/29/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/5/2023
Date: May 02, 202410/4/2023
Date: May 07, 20243/13/2023
Date: May 03, 202412/27/2023
Date: May 05, 20241/31/2024
Date: May 02, 20241/26/2024
Date: May 01, 202412/26/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/12/2024
Date: May 04, 20249/13/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/26/2024
Date: May 12, 20248/4/2023
Date: May 03, 202411/20/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/12/2024
Date: May 07, 20242/23/2024
Date: May 02, 20249/27/2023
Date: May 21, 20243/13/2023
Date: May 09, 20242/16/2024
Date: May 04, 20241/31/2024
Date: May 03, 20242/20/2024
Date: May 02, 20246/2/2023
Date: May 01, 202412/7/2023
Date: May 08, 20246/21/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/14/2023
Date: May 02, 20243/31/2023
Date: May 02, 20247/11/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/9/2024
Date: May 02, 20247/6/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/26/2024
Date: May 02, 20249/27/2023
Date: May 02, 20241/5/2024
Date: May 03, 202412/7/2023
Date: May 04, 20247/19/2023
Date: May 02, 202412/27/2023
Date: May 12, 202412/8/2023
Date: May 09, 20242/7/2024
Date: May 06, 20243/1/2024
Date: May 02, 20241/9/2024
Date: May 02, 20242/28/2024
Date: May 31, 20244/18/2023
Date: May 06, 20247/10/2023
Date: May 01, 20246/2/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/21/2023
Date: May 13, 202412/7/2023
Date: May 05, 202410/24/2023
Date: May 01, 20242/12/2024
Date: May 05, 20241/8/2024
Date: May 02, 20242/7/2024
Date: May 01, 20243/20/2023
Date: May 03, 20248/31/2023
Date: May 02, 20246/12/2023
Date: May 17, 20247/6/2023
Date: May 16, 20245/15/2023
Date: May 03, 20242/12/2024
Date: May 03, 2152/12/2024
Date: May 02, 20244/3/2023
Date: May 03, 20246/1/2023
Date: May 05, 20249/27/2023
Date: May 03, 20242/6/2024
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 17, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.