Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Poinciana Portfolio Services, Llc., As Assignee, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Martinez Colon, Jaime L, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, Tenant 3, Tenant 4, (total of 8) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 19, 2023 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2056 | Docket Event | ||
May 11, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.