Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Progress Residential Borrower 2, Llc, filed a(n) Landlord-Tenant - Property case against Anderson, Joseph, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with Sanders-Morency, Gabrielle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2022 |
CategoryCounty Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 21, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeLandlord-Tenant |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
Date: January 12, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | COUNTY CIVIL-LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 03/22/2024 AT 3:00 PM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE | |
January 30, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED POSTED, DATE SERVED: 1/21/2023@ PERSON SERVED: JOSEPH ANERSON | |
January 18, 2023 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $195.00 RECEIPT #2023000486 | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT FOR TENANT EVICTION (3 DAY/ CT ) | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/28/2022 CASE NUMBER 2022 CC 004955 EV |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.