Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Security Credit Services Llc, filed a(n) County Civil case against Acevedo, Vanessa, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with Sanders-Morency, Gabrielle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2022 |
CategoryCounty Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 18, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: September 08, 2022MOTION FOR DEFAULT (CANT DEFAULT-ANSWER FILED)
Date: October 17, 2022NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 05, 2024NOTICE OF FILING (PROOF OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM/COSTS/NON MILITARY AFFIDAVEIT)
Date: January 25, 2024COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2022NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE
Date: January 12, 2024ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE AND TO CANCEL HEARING
Date: February 19, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 08, 2022STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED
Date: January 25, 2024NOTICE OF HEARING
Date: March 09, 2024ANSWER FROM DEFENDANT
Date: October 07, 2022STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: September 08, 2022PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2022084909
Date: September 13, 2022SUMMONS RETURNED, SUBSTITUTE SERVED. DATE SERVED: 09/19/2022 @ 3:39PM PARTY SERVED: VANESSA ACEVEDO
Date: September 20, 2022MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT
Date: January 25, 2024SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: September 09, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 15, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR CONTINUANCE | |
March 09, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 05, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF HEARING | |
March 04, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT SET FOR 03/19/2024 AT 10:30 AM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE | |
February 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ORDER ON PLAINTIFF'S STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE AND TO CANCEL HEARING | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF FILING (PROOF OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM/COSTS/NON MILITARY AFFIDAVEIT) | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | STATEMENT OF GOOD CAUSE WHY CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT | |
January 12, 2024 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF INTENT TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO PROSECUTE | |
January 11, 2024 | Docket Event | COUNTY CIVIL-LACK OF PROSECUTION SET FOR 03/22/2024 AT 3:00 PM IN 5E BEFORE JUDGE: SANDERS-MORENCY, GABRIELLE |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.