Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Poinciana Portfolio Services, Llc., As Assignee, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Ambach, Gwendolyn S, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, Tenant 3, Tenant 4, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 12, 2022 |
CategoryCounty Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2053 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.