Case Last Refreshed: 3 months ago
Poinciana Portfolio Services Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Canela, Gabriel, Garcia, Rosa, Mainstreet Acquisition Corp, Tenant #1, Tenant #2, (total of 9) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateFebruary 18, 2022 |
CategoryCounty Civil |
Last RefreshedJanuary 17, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
11/8/2022
Date: January 01, 202411/29/2022
Date: January 05, 20242/18/2022
Date: January 18, 205412/23/2022
Date: January 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 18, 2054 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.