Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Poinciana Portfolio Services, Llc., filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Santiago, Nilda E, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, Tenant 3, Tenant 4, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 20, 2022 |
CategoryCounty Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
1/20/2022
Date: May 03, 20241/20/2022
Date: May 01, 20541/23/2023
Date: May 01, 20241/28/2022
Date: May 09, 20241/18/2023
Date: May 05, 20241/27/2022
Date: May 03, 20242/15/2022
Date: May 05, 20241/10/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/9/2022
Date: May 05, 20241/27/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/20/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/11/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/8/2024
Date: May 02, 20241/20/2022
Date: May 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2054 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.