Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
The Bank Of New York Mellon, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Capital One Bank Usa Na, Foundation Finance Company Llc, Rivera, Martha, Unknown Parties Claiming Interest By Through Under, Unknown Spouse Of Martha Rivera, (total of 7) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedJuly 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
2/1/2023
Date: May 03, 202412/16/2022
Date: May 01, 202412/22/2022
Date: May 16, 20242/1/2023
Date: May 01, 202412/16/2022
Date: May 01, 205612/16/2022
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2056 | Docket Event | ||
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.