Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Association Of Poinciana Villages, Inc., filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Cbm Estates Llc, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALVARO, CHAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 20, 2022 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 20, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 12, 2070 | Docket Event | ||
January 13, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
June 23, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2022057601 | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | CIVIL COVER SHEET | |
June 20, 2022 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.