Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Pineda Gebara Fecuri, Joao Victor, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedOctober 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CITATION FILED AD82BLE
Date: September 30, 2021COPY OF CITATION
Date: October 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
November 01, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | D6 ISSUED 10/25/2021 / LICENSE SUSPENDED | |
October 25, 2021 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT FAILED TO APPEAR FOR COMPANION INFRACTION D6 LICENSE | |
October 11, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 10/25/2021 AT 8:15 AM IN 4A BEFORE JUDGE: JANCEWICZ, STEFANIA C | |
October 08, 2021 | Docket Event | COPY OF CITATION | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED AD82BLE | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 09/30/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 039674 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.