Case Last Refreshed: 6 months ago
Citibank N.A., filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Lindblad, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with Sanders-Morency, Gabrielle presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeSanders-Morency, Gabrielle Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 20, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedOctober 11, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
PAYMENT $3.00 RECEIPT #2022039383
Date: April 28, 2022LETTER
Date: April 26, 2022CERTIFICATE OF DELIVERY
Date: April 08, 2022FINAL JUDGMENT - RECORDED (OR.6186.2515. / 2022053497)
Date: April 03, 2022SETTLEMENT DEFAULT AFFIDAVIT
Date: March 22, 2022ORDER ACCEPTING STIPULATION AND DISMISSING CASE
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF TERMINATION OF REPRESENTATION FOR THE DEFENDANT
Date: November 08, 2021NOTICE OF FILING SUPPORTIN AFFIDAVIT
Date: October 29, 2021STIPULATION FOR SETTLEMENT
Date: November 02, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: October 29, 2021PLAINTIFF'S DISCLOSURE OF WITNESS AND DOCUMENTS
Date: October 29, 2021PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR SUMMARY DISPOSITION
Date: October 29, 2021DEFENDANT'S ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: August 17, 2021NOTICE OF VIDEO NON-JURY TRIAL (30 MINUTES)
Date: August 16, 2021NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: August 12, 2021AMENDED FORMAL NOTICE OF VIRTUAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: August 12, 2021NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS
Date: August 09, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: July 22, 2021PAYMENT $310.00 RECEIPT #2021065947
Date: July 22, 2021GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: July 20, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: July 22, 2021NOTICE OF DESIGNATIO O FLEAD ATTORNEY
Date: July 20, 2021PROOF OF DEFENDANT'S ADDRESS
Date: July 20, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: July 20, 2021$3110.06 - STATEMENT OF CLAIM
Date: July 20, 20213/22/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/8/2022
Date: April 04, 20244/3/2022
Date: April 03, 20244/28/2022
Date: April 03, 20244/26/2022
Date: April 01, 202411/2/2021
Date: April 02, 202410/29/2021
Date: April 28, 207210/29/2021
Date: April 05, 202410/29/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/18/2021
Date: April 02, 202411/8/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/12/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/17/2021
Date: April 04, 20248/12/2021
Date: April 02, 20248/12/2021
Date: April 07, 20248/16/2021
Date: April 06, 20248/9/2021
Date: April 02, 20247/30/2021
Date: April 03, 20247/22/2021
Date: April 01, 20248/9/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/22/2021
Date: April 02, 20247/20/2021
Date: April 03, 20247/20/2021
Date: April 10, 20247/20/2021
Date: April 01, 20247/20/2021
Date: April 04, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 28, 2072 | Docket Event | ||
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.