Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Elr Restoration Inc Aao German Gutierrez, filed a(n) General Small Claims - Small Claims case against Universal Property And Casualty Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 06, 2021 |
CategorySmall Claims |
Last RefreshedSeptember 16, 2023 |
Practice AreaSmall Claims |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Small Claims |
COMPLAINT
Date: April 06, 2021REQUEST FOR VIRTUAL DISPUTE RESOLUTION FROM PLAINTIFF
Date: April 08, 20213/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/24/2022
Date: May 07, 20242/23/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/18/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/10/2022
Date: May 01, 20562/11/2022
Date: May 08, 20242/17/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/11/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/15/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/10/2022
Date: May 01, 20322/8/2022
Date: May 03, 20242/11/2022
Date: May 01, 20322/10/2022
Date: May 10, 20242/11/2022
Date: May 01, 20565/21/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/8/2021
Date: May 01, 20245/25/2021
Date: May 02, 20242/8/2022
Date: May 08, 20245/21/2021
Date: May 03, 20244/9/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/7/2021
Date: May 03, 20244/6/2021
Date: May 09, 20244/6/2021
Date: May 05, 20244/30/2021
Date: May 02, 20244/6/2021
Date: May 04, 20244/6/2021
Date: May 01, 20244/6/2021
Date: May 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2056 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2056 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2032 | Docket Event | ||
May 01, 2032 | Docket Event | ||
May 10, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.