Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Shiver, Jason Daniel, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryFelony |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
WARRANT ARREST-BOOKING REPORT FILED WANTED PERSONS TABLE ADVICE TO DEFENDANT
Date: March 29, 2022OSCEOLA COUNTY SHERIFF'S OFFICE TRANSPORTATION COST WORKSHEET
Date: March 30, 2022(COPY) CHECK TO CLERK'S OFFICE
Date: January 24, 2022NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY
Date: March 28, 2022PAYMENT $500.00 RECEIPT #2022005895
Date: January 20, 2022NOTICE OF DEMAND FOR DISCOVERY
Date: March 28, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN
Date: October 26, 2021ARRAIGNMENT SCHEDULED. NOTICE SENT
Date: October 07, 2021CAPIAS RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: October 06, 2021CAPIAS ISSUED
Date: September 30, 2021ORDER OF FORFEITURE(S) OF BAIL BOND (CASH) - RECORDED (OR.6083.2501. / 2021174873)
Date: November 09, 2021WARRANT ISSUED
Date: November 09, 2021CASH APPEARANCE BOND
Date: October 26, 2021LETTER
Date: November 16, 2021NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH RULE 2.516 AND DESIGNATION OF E-MAIL ADDRESSES
Date: March 28, 2022LETTER TO JUDGE YOUNG FROM DEFENDANT
Date: November 19, 2021MAIL RETURNED
Date: January 14, 2022LETTER TO JUDGE YOUNG FROM DEFENDANT W/ JUDGE'S NOTES - TOOK NO ACTION
Date: November 29, 2021MAIL RETURNED
Date: October 18, 2021MAIL RETURNED
Date: November 17, 2021CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE
Date: August 15, 2022SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET
Date: July 26, 2022RESTITUTION ORDER/NAME AND ADDRESS OF VICTIM
Date: July 26, 2022CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET
Date: July 26, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: May 18, 2022PLEA AGREEMENT
Date: July 26, 2022MOTION TO CONTINUE
Date: May 16, 2022NOTICE OF PROVISION OF WITNESS LIST
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF DISCOVERY (SUPPLEMENTAL)
Date: April 21, 2022NOTICE OF COURT DATE TO BONDSMAN
Date: April 06, 2022WAIVER OF SPEEDY TRIAL
Date: April 19, 2022WAIVER OF PRESENCE AT PRETRIAL CONFERENCE
Date: April 19, 2022NOTICE OF PRIOR CONVICTIONS AND CRIMINAL HISTORY
Date: April 14, 2022BOND (COPY SURETY)
Date: April 05, 2022WARRANT ARREST AFFIDAVIT (HILLSBOROUGH COUNTY)
Date: March 31, 2022WARRANT RETURNED EXECUTED
Date: March 31, 2022MOTION TO REINSTATE AND/OR REDUCE BOND
Date: March 29, 2022NOTICE OF PRETRIAL AND TRIAL
Date: March 29, 2022FIRST APPEARANCE HELD. ORDER OF COMMITMENT.
Date: March 29, 2022Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF BOND DISCHARGE | |
July 27, 2022 | Docket Event | CERTIFICATE OF COSTS IMPOSED - RECORDED (OR.6258.884. / 2022114921) | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | SENTENCING GUIDELINES SCORESHEET | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | RESTITUTION ORDER/NAME AND ADDRESS OF VICTIM | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | CREDIT FOR TIME SERVED WORSHEET | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | PLEA AGREEMENT | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | FINGERPRINTS CONCERNING ABOVE-NAMED DEFENDANT | |
July 26, 2022 | Docket Event | FELONY SENTENCE ORDER/PROBATION - RECORDED (OR.6258.360. / 2022114778) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.