Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Hamilton, Laquana, filed a(n) Circuit Civil case against Fca Us Llc, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedAugust 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
|
COMPLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS
Date: December 22, 202112/22/2021
Date: January 15, 2059Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2059 | Docket Event | ||
January 12, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFF'S REPLY TO DEFENDANT'S AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT NOTICE OF APPEARANCE | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS | |
January 11, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT FCA US LLC ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES TO PLAINTIFF COMPLAINT | |
January 05, 2022 | Docket Event | DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESSES | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
December 29, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $410.00 RECEIPT #2021114583 | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPLAINT AND WRITTEN DISCOVERY REQUESTS | |
December 22, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 12/22/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 CA 003262 PL |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.