Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Poinciana Portfolio Services, Llc., As Assignee, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against Agosto Cardona, Cynthia, Cardona, Raul, Tenant 1, Tenant 2, Tenant 3, (total of 6) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 22, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)
Date: January 13, 2022COMPLAINT TO FORECLOSE CLAIM OF LIEN
Date: December 22, 202112/22/2021
Date: January 03, 202412/22/2021
Date: January 15, 20541/13/2022
Date: January 01, 20242/11/2022
Date: January 01, 2024CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: December 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2054 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 11, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND ORDER OF DISMISSAL | |
February 04, 2022 | Docket Event | STIPULATION FOR INSTALLMENT SETTLEMENT | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC) | |
January 13, 2022 | Docket Event | LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR | |
January 03, 2022 | Docket Event | SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY) | |
December 28, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $437.50 RECEIPT #2021114324 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.