Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Lh-Np-Strat Delaware Owner Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case against Brown'S 1998, Llc, Celebration Residential Owners Association, Inc., Stayton, Rebecca V, Unknown Tenant #1, Unknown Tenant #2, (total of 5) See All in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with SCHREIBER, MARGARET H presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateOctober 11, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedMarch 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
10/11/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/11/2021
Date: May 02, 205510/13/2021
Date: May 01, 202411/2/2021
Date: May 02, 202411/3/2021
Date: May 03, 202412/9/2021
Date: May 02, 202412/10/2021
Date: May 03, 202412/10/2021
Date: May 05, 202412/20/2021
Date: May 01, 20241/18/2022
Date: May 07, 20241/18/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/18/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/18/2022
Date: May 02, 20701/21/2022
Date: May 02, 20243/15/2022
Date: May 04, 20243/23/2022
Date: May 02, 20244/7/2022
Date: May 01, 20244/15/2022
Date: May 01, 20244/15/2022
Date: May 02, 20634/22/2022
Date: May 03, 20244/24/2022
Date: May 14, 20244/25/2022
Date: May 02, 20245/6/2022
Date: May 02, 20247/27/2022
Date: May 02, 202411/29/2022
Date: May 02, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 02, 2070 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2063 | Docket Event | ||
May 02, 2055 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.