Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Eagle Lake Phase 1 Subdivision Homeowners Associat, filed a(n) General Property - Property case against An, Xin Wei, Unknown Parties In Possession, Zhou, Yun, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedDecember 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: October 04, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC)
Date: October 18, 2021VALUE OF REAL PROPERTY OR MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE CLAIM
Date: September 30, 2021STREAMLINED CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: September 30, 2021COMPLAINT FOR LIEN FORECLOSURE AND MONETARY DAMAGES
Date: September 30, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: September 30, 2021NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (IMG)
Date: September 30, 2021CIVIL COVER SHEET
Date: September 30, 202110/4/2021
Date: April 12, 20249/30/2021
Date: April 02, 20249/30/2021
Date: April 03, 20249/30/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/30/2021
Date: April 19, 202410/18/2021
Date: April 01, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 19, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 12, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
December 17, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER SUBSTITUTING PARTY DEFENDANT | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO SUBSTITUTE PARTY DEFENDANT | |
December 02, 2021 | Docket Event | SUMMONS RETURNED, INDIVIDUALLY SERVED DATE SERVED: 10/7/2021@340PM PARTY SERVED: UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION | |
October 18, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF LIS PENDENS (REC) |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.