Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Gomez, Juan, Zorrilla-Morel, Yanelly Dinorah, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Clear Blue Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 15, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by YANELLY DINORAH ZORRILLA-MOREL and JUAN GOMEZ against CLEAR BLUE INSURANCE COMPANY. The plaintiffs allege that they had a homeowners insurance policy with the defendant, and the policy was in effect when their property loca...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 15, 2021STANDING CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER (GENERAL TRACK)
Date: October 06, 202110/6/2021
Date: January 03, 20249/15/2021
Date: January 15, 206310/13/2021
Date: January 01, 20249/15/2021
Date: January 08, 20249/15/2021
Date: January 07, 20249/15/2021
Date: January 20, 2024PLAINTIFFS FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS
Date: September 15, 2021PLAINTIFFS FIRST SET OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: September 15, 2021NOTICE OF FILING
Date: September 15, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: October 13, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 15, 2063 | Docket Event | ||
January 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.