Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Nales, Doreen, Navarro, Jose I, Navarro, Luz, Orellano Navarro, Damarys, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Getwell Transportation, Inc., Otero, Eva Rosalie, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with YOUNG, TOM presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 01, 1988 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 22, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
1/2/2024
Date: May 04, 20249/28/2023
Date: May 02, 202411/14/2023
Date: May 04, 20249/28/2023
Date: May 08, 202411/17/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/13/2024
Date: May 01, 19889/29/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/18/2023
Date: May 02, 20242/1/2024
Date: May 01, 202410/2/2023
Date: May 31, 202410/2/2023
Date: May 05, 20249/21/2023
Date: May 14, 20241/2/2024
Date: May 03, 20241/24/2024
Date: May 02, 202411/17/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/2/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/25/2023
Date: May 01, 202412/8/2023
Date: May 20, 20242/14/2024
Date: May 02, 202411/14/2023
Date: May 03, 20247/6/2023
Date: May 03, 20242/13/2024
Date: May 01, 20242/2/2024
Date: May 04, 202410/3/2023
Date: May 01, 20419/28/2023
Date: May 14, 20249/22/2023
Date: May 04, 202411/28/2023
Date: May 04, 20241/18/2024
Date: May 01, 202412/22/2021
Date: May 05, 20248/23/2021
Date: May 02, 20248/23/2021
Date: May 03, 20248/23/2021
Date: May 01, 20248/23/2021
Date: May 05, 202410/21/2021
Date: May 02, 202410/20/2021
Date: May 07, 202412/20/2021
Date: May 06, 20246/30/2023
Date: May 02, 202412/17/2021
Date: May 01, 20243/2/2023
Date: May 02, 20249/13/2021
Date: May 06, 2024PLAINTIFF REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 21, 2021REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO DEFENDANT GETWELL TRANSPORTATION INC
Date: August 23, 2021COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: August 23, 2021REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS TO DEFENDANT GETWELL TRANSPORTATION INC
Date: August 23, 2021NOTICE OF SERVICE OF INTERROGATORIES
Date: August 23, 2021SUMMONS TO BE ISSUED
Date: August 23, 2021SUMMONS ISSUED (EMAILED TO ATTY)
Date: September 13, 2021MISDEMEANOR CORRESPONDENCE TO JUDGE
Date: December 17, 2021DEFEDNANT'S FIRST REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION TO PLAINTIFF
Date: October 20, 2021AMENDED COMPLAINT AND DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL
Date: December 22, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 01, 2041 | Docket Event | ||
May 31, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 08, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.