Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case against Hernandez-Chacon, Febe Sarai, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EPPERSON, HAL presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEPPERSON, HAL Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 31, 2021 |
CategoryTraffic |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2022 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
CITATION FILED AEDODOE
Date: August 31, 2021PAYMENT $166.00 RECEIPT #2021090572
Date: October 12, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2023 | Docket Event | ||
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $166.00 RECEIPT #2021090572 | |
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 11/16/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR | |
September 15, 2021 | Docket Event | COMPANION INFRACTION SET FOR 09/17/2021 AT 9:30 AM IN 5B BEFORE JUDGE: EPPERSON, HAL C JR | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CITATION FILED AEDODOE | |
August 31, 2021 | Docket Event | CASE FILED 08/31/2021 CASE NUMBER 2021 TR 035213 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.