Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Martinez Melecio, Kevin W filed a(n) Guardianship,Conservatorship - Probate case in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 16, 2021 |
CategoryGuardianship |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2022 |
Practice AreaProbate |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGuardianship,Conservatorship |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF PLENARY GUARDIANSHIP OF PERSON AND PROPERTY | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING PLENARY GUARDIAN OF PERSON AND PROPERTY | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR TWO EXAMINING COMMITTEE MEMBERS | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION FOR TWO EXAMINING COMMITTEE MEMBERS | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | JOINT STIPULATION FOR TWO EXAMINING COMMITTEE MEMBERS | |
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | ORDER APPOINTING EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIAN | |
August 30, 2021 | Docket Event | LETTERS OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP - RECORDED (OR.6032.2541. / 2021134498) | |
August 27, 2021 | Docket Event | PROPOSED ORDER/LETTERS W-JUDGE | |
August 26, 2021 | Docket Event | UNSIGNED LETTERS OF EMERGENCY TEMPORARY GUARDIANSHIP |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.