Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Raph, Suzanne, Vargas, Andrew J., filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Security First Insurance Company, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT J presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
This complaint is filed by Suzanne Raph against Security First Insurance Company. The complaint alleges that there was a homeowners insurance policy in effect with a policy number of P000101831. The property covered by the policy is located at 2729 W...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE | |
February 23, 2022 | Docket Event | CASE CLOSED | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR | |
February 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENANT'S MOTION TO DISMISS PLAINTIFF'S COMPLAINT | |
February 10, 2022 | Docket Event | PAYMENT $10.00 RECEIPT #2022013211 |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.