Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Stayton, Robert Jl, filed a(n) General Commercial - Commercial case against Celebration Community Development District, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeEGAN, ROBERT Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 08, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeGeneral Commercial |
This complaint is filed by Robert J.L. Stayton against Celebration Community Development District (CCDD) in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in Osceola County, Florida. The plaintiff alleges that on January 16, 2021, while walking on t...
COMPLAINT
Date: September 08, 2021GENERAL CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER
Date: September 13, 2021E-MAIL CORRESPONDENCE -CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN ORDER
Date: September 09, 20217/29/2022
Date: April 02, 20248/10/2022
Date: April 03, 20248/9/2022
Date: April 03, 20247/12/2022
Date: April 02, 20244/5/2022
Date: April 09, 20246/14/2022
Date: April 02, 20246/2/2022
Date: April 02, 20245/26/2022
Date: April 02, 20243/25/2022
Date: April 01, 20243/17/2022
Date: April 02, 20244/18/2022
Date: April 02, 20245/24/2022
Date: April 01, 20244/14/2022
Date: April 05, 20249/13/2021
Date: April 03, 20243/22/2022
Date: April 02, 20242/16/2022
Date: April 02, 20249/9/2021
Date: April 01, 20249/8/2021
Date: April 03, 2024Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
April 02, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.