Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Francis, Anthony, Glenz, Thomas P, Tracy Francis, As Perdonal Representative For The Estate Of Anthony Francis, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case against Lewis, Robert, Sms Systems, Inc., in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with EGAN, ROBERT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
This complaint was filed in the Circuit Court of the Ninth Judicial Circuit in and for Osceola County, Florida. The plaintiff, Anthony Francis, is suing the defendants, Robert Lewis and SMC Systems, Inc., for damages exceeding $30,000. The complaint ...
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
February 21, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT AMENDED NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DISCLOSURE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FOR SERVICE BY ELECTRONIC MAIL | |
January 22, 2022 | Docket Event | LINE DOCKETED IN ERROR | |
January 21, 2022 | Docket Event | ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO ENLARGE TIME TO PERFECT SERVICE OF PROCESS UPON DEFENDANT, ROBERT LEWIS | |
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event | PLAINTIFFS REQUEST FOR COPIES |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.