Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Dinkins-Anderson, Vansia, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Dexter, Victor Anthony, Venom Motor Sports, Llc, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts Circuit with ARENDAS, CHRISTINE E presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 20, 2021 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedFebruary 05, 2024 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
Filing Court HouseCircuit |
This complaint was filed by Vansia Dinkins-Anderson against Victor Anthony Dexter, individually and on behalf of Venom Motor Sports LLC, and Venom Motor Sports LLC. The complaint alleges breach of contract, fraudulent misrepresentation, and unjust en...
1/12/2024
Date: May 02, 20249/19/2023
Date: May 02, 202411/14/2022
Date: May 02, 20242/9/2022
Date: May 02, 20248/18/2022
Date: May 02, 20249/13/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/26/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/6/2021
Date: May 02, 20241/2/2024
Date: May 01, 20245/10/2022
Date: May 04, 202412/17/2023
Date: May 09, 20244/25/2022
Date: May 01, 20241/16/2024
Date: May 01, 20243/24/2022
Date: May 02, 202410/15/2021
Date: May 06, 20246/22/2023
Date: May 02, 20245/5/2022
Date: May 04, 202411/17/2021
Date: May 04, 202411/14/2022
Date: May 01, 20242/6/2023
Date: May 01, 202410/12/2021
Date: May 02, 202411/15/2021
Date: May 03, 20248/30/2023
Date: May 02, 20248/20/2021
Date: May 20, 20246/1/2023
Date: May 09, 20247/25/2023
Date: May 01, 202411/8/2022
Date: May 02, 20241/8/2024
Date: May 02, 20244/25/2022
Date: May 04, 20247/7/2023
Date: May 02, 20244/4/2023
Date: May 02, 2024MOTION FOR EXTENTION W/BLANK ORDER (FTJ) (NO ENVELOPES)
Date: October 06, 2021COMPLAINT AND JURY DEMAND
Date: August 20, 2021ANSWER ANDAFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES
Date: October 15, 2021COURT'S CASE MANAGEMENT PLAN/ORDER GENERAL TRACK
Date: November 17, 2021CIVIL CASE MANAGEMENT NOTIFICATION
Date: November 15, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 09, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 06, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
May 03, 2024 | Docket Event |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.