Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Baez, Carmen, Baez, Luis, filed a(n) Breach of Contract - Commercial case against Family Security Insurance Company Inc, in the jurisdiction of Osceola County. This case was filed in Osceola County Superior Courts with ALVARO, CHAD presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeALVARO, CHAD Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 15, 1976 |
CategoryCircuit Civil |
Last RefreshedSeptember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaCommercial |
Filing LocationOsceola County, FL |
Matter TypeBreach of Contract |
COMPLAINT
Date: August 20, 20219/29/2021
Date: January 07, 20249/22/2021
Date: January 05, 20248/20/2021
Date: January 15, 1976DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: September 22, 2021EXHIBIT B TO DEFENDANT MOTION TO DISMISS AND MOTION FOR MORE DEFINITE STATEMENT
Date: September 29, 2021Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 05, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 04, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 03, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 01, 2024 | Docket Event | ||
January 02, 2023 | Docket Event | NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT | |
December 22, 2022 | Docket Event | DEFENDANT'S NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.